NY S00944 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the ballots of deceased military personnel shall be counted toward the election for which they were cast.
Title
Provides that the ballots of deceased military personnel shall be counted toward the election for which they were cast.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2018-05-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.840 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2017-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.420 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A04342 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in election law