NY S00979 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to electronic financial disclosures of members and candidates of the legislature and requires creation of electronic version of disclosure statement.
Title
Relates to electronic financial disclosures of members and candidates of the legislature and requires creation of electronic version of disclosure statement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.597 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03841 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations