NY S00984 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires dihydropyrimidine dehydrogenase deficiency testing prior to fluoropyrmidine or other antimetabolite treatment; requires policies and contracts of insurance to include coverage for dihydropyrimidine dehydrogenase deficiency testing; provides for dihydropyrimidine dehydrogenase deficiency testing under the medical assistance program.
Title
Requires dihydropyrimidine dehydrogenase deficiency testing prior to fluoropyrmidine or other antimetabolite treatment; requires policies and contracts of insurance to include coverage for dihydropyrimidine dehydrogenase deficiency testing; provides for dihydropyrimidine dehydrogenase deficiency testing under the medical assistance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.330 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07533 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to health