NY S01020 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that state mandates shall not be implemented in school districts after such district has passed a budget; provides that any such mandates shall be implemented in the following fiscal year.
Title
Provides that state mandates shall not be implemented in school districts after such district has passed a budget; provides that any such mandates shall be implemented in the following fiscal year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Assembly | referred to education |
2018-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.571 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.819 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04789 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in education