NY S01023 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases fines and penalties for passing a stopped school bus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases fines and penalties for passing a stopped school bus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14Assemblyreferred to transportation
2017-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1257
2017-05-02SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-01-06SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A01207 (Same As) 2017-01-11 - referred to transportation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback