NY S01026 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enables veterans and reservists to receive benefit information upon applying for or renewing a driver's license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enables veterans and reservists to receive benefit information upon applying for or renewing a driver's license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-12SenateAMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 1026
2019-06-12SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-12Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-12AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to agriculture
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-04SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 1026A
2019-01-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-01-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-01-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.51
2019-01-10SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A02331 (Same As) 2019-02-27 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback