NY S01028 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-19 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-19 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to changing the definition of elevated blood lead levels from a blood lead level greater than or equal to ten micrograms of lead per deciliter of whole blood to five micrograms of lead per deciliter of whole blood.
Title
Relates to changing the definition of elevated blood lead levels from a blood lead level greater than or equal to ten micrograms of lead per deciliter of whole blood to five micrograms of lead per deciliter of whole blood.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.331 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05779 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - enacting clause stricken