NY S01063 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring counselors to have certain courses of study or equivalent on-the-job experience including on providing trauma-informed, patient-centered care, treating co-occurring disorders and sensitivity training.
Title
Relates to requiring counselors to have certain courses of study or equivalent on-the-job experience including on providing trauma-informed, patient-centered care, treating co-occurring disorders and sensitivity training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism And Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism And Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2020-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.64 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1063A |
2020-01-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2019-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A09568 (Same As) 2020-01-24 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse