NY S01064 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires suspension of a driver's license for a period of 60 days when a driver is convicted of passing a stopped school bus twice in 18 months.
Title
Requires suspension of a driver's license for a period of 60 days when a driver is convicted of passing a stopped school bus twice in 18 months.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-14 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2018-04-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1064A |
2018-04-30 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-30 | Senate | returned to senate |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-01-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.142 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.956 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00719 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - reported referred to codes