NY S01079 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of labor, in consultation with the education department, the office of temporary and disability assistance, the office of children and family services, and any other entity the department deems appropriate, to produce a report regarding summer youth employment programs funded by state, federal and local appropriations.
Title
Requires the department of labor, in consultation with the education department, the office of temporary and disability assistance, the office of children and family services, and any other entity the department deems appropriate, to produce a report regarding summer youth employment programs funded by state, federal and local appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.18 |
2020-11-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.297 |
2020-11-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.165 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6393 |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2020-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.239 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.598 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06393 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.18