NY S01086 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowances for the costs, up to eighty dollars, of diapers for an eligible child, two years of age or younger.
Title
Relates to allowances for the costs, up to eighty dollars, of diapers for an eligible child, two years of age or younger.
Sponsors
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Children And Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Children And Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2019-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.854 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1086B |
2019-04-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-02-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1086A |
2019-02-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A02567 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to social services