NY S01087 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to forms of marihuana authorized for medical use.
Title
Relates to forms of marihuana authorized for medical use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-04-25 | Senate | DEFEATED IN HEALTH |
2017-03-13 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06009 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - advanced to third reading cal.627