NY S01092 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.360
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the performance of a pelvic examination without consent on an anesthetized or unconscious person; includes unauthorized pelvic examinations under professional misconduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the performance of a pelvic examination without consent on an anesthetized or unconscious person; includes unauthorized pelvic examinations under professional misconduct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-07AssemblySIGNED CHAP.360
2019-10-01SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.273
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a6325c
2019-06-14Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-14AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-11SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 1092E
2019-06-05SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1092D
2019-06-05SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-05Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-05AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-05-13Assemblyreferred to health
2019-05-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 1092C
2019-04-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.454
2019-04-01SenatePRINT NUMBER 1092B
2019-04-01SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2019-02-06SenatePRINT NUMBER 1092A
2019-02-06SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2019-01-10SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A06325 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s1092e

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01092&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01092&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01092
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01092&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01092A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01092&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01092B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01092&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01092C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01092&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01092D
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01092&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01092E
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S1092#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S1092#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S1092#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01092&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback