NY S01110 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to selling New York state labeled alcoholic beverages at retail for consumption on the premises of a holder of a farm distillery license.
Title
Relates to selling New York state labeled alcoholic beverages at retail for consumption on the premises of a holder of a farm distillery license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2019-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.319 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A06618 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to economic development