NY S01120 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1431
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1431
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the court to increase the amount of the award to a person who initiates a qui tam action where such action includes disclosure of information related to the use of government funds during a state of emergency.
Title
Requires the court to increase the amount of the award to a person who initiates a qui tam action where such action includes disclosure of information related to the use of government funds during a state of emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1431 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1745 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01431 (Same As) 2022-12-28 - signed chap.791