NY S01122 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 1122A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 1122A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to diagnosis, care and treatment of injured employees by certified nurse practioners.
Title
Relates to diagnosis, care and treatment of injured employees by certified nurse practioners.
Sponsors
Sen. David Valesky [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Jose Peralta [D] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Sen. Joseph Robach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1122A |
2018-01-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A07301 (Same As) 2018-02-02 - print number 7301a