NY S01126 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the democracy preservation act; prohibits contributions by foreign-influenced business entities; requires certification.
Title
Enacts the democracy preservation act; prohibits contributions by foreign-influenced business entities; requires certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2022-01-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.5 |
2022-01-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1126B |
2022-01-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1323 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1126A |
2021-04-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2021-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07458 (Same As) 2022-02-28 - print number 7458a