NY S01128 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.587
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.587
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to voter registration form distribution and assistance.
Title
Relates to voter registration form distribution and assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 114 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.587 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.30 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.334 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a2599a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1232 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1128A |
2019-05-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02599 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.587