NY S01130 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-18 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-18 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notification requirements for a seven day license to sell liquor at retail for consumption off the premises.
Title
Relates to notification requirements for a seven day license to sell liquor at retail for consumption off the premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development And Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2019-06-18 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | recommitted to economic development |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substitution reconsidered |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.113 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | substituted for a3326a |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2019-03-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-26 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1130A |
2019-02-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.67 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A03326 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN