NY S01130 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Passed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Passed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-15 - APPROVAL MEMO.40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of dogs, cats and rabbits by retail pet shops; authorizes collaboration with entities to provide space to showcase cats or dogs owned by certain entities for the purpose of adoption.
Title
Prohibits the sale of dogs, cats and rabbits by retail pet shops; authorizes collaboration with entities to provide space to showcase cats or dogs owned by certain entities for the purpose of adoption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-15 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.40 |
2022-12-15 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.681 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.296 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | substituted for a4283 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.979 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-05-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.735 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A04283 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - substituted by s1130