NY S01137 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - PRINT NUMBER 1137A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-20 - PRINT NUMBER 1137A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits police officers from using racial and ethnic profiling; requires that a procedure be established for the taking and review of complaints against police officers for racial and ethnic profiling; allows an action for injunctive relief and/or damages to be brought against a law enforcement agency, any agent of a law enforcement agency and the supervisor of an agent.
Title
Prohibits police officers from using racial and ethnic profiling; requires that a procedure be established for the taking and review of complaints against police officers for racial and ethnic profiling; allows an action for injunctive relief and/or damages to be brought against a law enforcement agency, any agent of a law enforcement agency and the supervisor of an agent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1137A |
2020-05-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A04615 (Same As) 2020-06-08 - REFERRED TO RULES