NY S01143 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires every mandated reporter to make a report to the register unless the register has knowledge of the incident.
Title
Requires every mandated reporter to make a report to the register unless the register has knowledge of the incident.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2019-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.69 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A02756 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - restored to third reading