NY S01148 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of coupons or use of a price reduction instrument to lower the price of certain tobacco products.
Title
Prohibits the use of coupons or use of a price reduction instrument to lower the price of certain tobacco products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.191 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A04365 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to health