NY S01168 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for initiative; empowers the electors with the ability to propose statutes and amendments to the constitution.
Title
Provides for initiative; empowers the electors with the ability to propose statutes and amendments to the constitution.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-27 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-07 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02636 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary