NY S01182 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating the medical professionals across rural New York state student loan repayment fund pilot program for certain participating professionals that make a two year commitment to practice in a tract or county defined by the health resources and services administration as being rural or eligible for a rural health grant.
Title
Relates to creating the medical professionals across rural New York state student loan repayment fund pilot program for certain participating professionals that make a two year commitment to practice in a tract or county defined by the health resources and services administration as being rural or eligible for a rural health grant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10081 (Same As) 2020-07-13 - held for consideration in health