NY S01191 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends a chapter of the laws of 2018 relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide job and vocational skills training to youth who have been adjudicated juvenile delinquents or juvenile offenders residing in a facility overseen by the office of children and family services, in relation to making certain provisions permanent; and providing for the repeal of provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Title
Amends a chapter of the laws of 2018 relating to the establishment of a pilot program to provide job and vocational skills training to youth who have been adjudicated juvenile delinquents or juvenile offenders residing in a facility overseen by the office of children and family services, in relation to making certain provisions permanent; and providing for the repeal of provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.193 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.148 |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | substituted for a838 |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2019-01-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.11 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00838 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.193