NY S01192 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires persons possessing any firearm to hold a firearms safety certificate; establishes application and training process therefor.
Title
Requires persons possessing any firearm to hold a firearms safety certificate; establishes application and training process therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-02-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.365 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-25 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1192B |
2021-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.862 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1192A |
2021-04-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2021-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07246 (Same As) 2022-02-08 - enacting clause stricken