NY S01194 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.195
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.195
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends a chapter of the laws of 2018 creating the digital currency task force to increase the members from 9 to 13.
Title
Amends a chapter of the laws of 2018 creating the digital currency task force to increase the members from 9 to 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.195 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.40 |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | substituted for a1914 |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2019-01-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.14 |
2019-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A01914 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.195