NY S01202 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to directing the state board of real property tax services to conduct a study on real property tax saturation.
Title
Relates to directing the state board of real property tax services to conduct a study on real property tax saturation.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2022-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.219 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2021-03-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.160 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06227 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to real property taxation