NY S01210 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - SIGNED CHAP.462
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - SIGNED CHAP.462
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for a program sponsor to amend a point system as part of a service award program.
Title
Allows for a program sponsor to amend a point system as part of a service award program.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] |
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.462 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.348 |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a6401 |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.286 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06401 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - substituted by s1210