NY S01222 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 1222B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 1222B
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides tax credit to certain volunteer firefighters, volunteer ambulance workers, volunteer hazardous materials workers and volunteer emergency medical service personnel of up to one thousand one hundred dollars for qualifying service; defines "qualifying service".
Title
Provides tax credit to certain volunteer firefighters, volunteer ambulance workers, volunteer hazardous materials workers and volunteer emergency medical service personnel of up to one thousand one hundred dollars for qualifying service; defines "qualifying service".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1222B |
2020-03-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1222A |
2020-02-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03479 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means