NY S01225 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York state clean energy tech production program as a self-directed program for industrial, commercial and large users in order to stimulate the growth and adoption of more efficient use of energy, greater use of advanced energy management products, deeper penetration of renewable energy resources, wider deployment of "distributed" energy resources, and storage.
Title
Establishes the New York state clean energy tech production program as a self-directed program for industrial, commercial and large users in order to stimulate the growth and adoption of more efficient use of energy, greater use of advanced energy management products, deeper penetration of renewable energy resources, wider deployment of "distributed" energy resources, and storage.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Sen. Elizabeth Little [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2018-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.331 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1225B |
2018-01-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-02 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2017-03-27 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1225A |
2017-03-27 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2017-03-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.173 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01705 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - print number 1705b