NY S01235 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - PRINT NUMBER 1235A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - PRINT NUMBER 1235A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a 10 day waiting period for the purchase of any firearm; establishes violations of such provisions shall constitute a class A misdemeanor.
Title
Establishes a 10 day waiting period for the purchase of any firearm; establishes violations of such provisions shall constitute a class A misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1235A |
2022-03-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1368 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09139 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - print number 9139a