NY S01268 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-18 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to equality of rights and protection against discrimination.
Title
Relates to equality of rights and protection against discrimination.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2022-03-01 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-28 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-03-04 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-02-09 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2021-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00760 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.47