NY S01273 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Safeguards cash accounts for people with developmental disabilities in a facility under the control of the commissioner of mental health, the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities and the commissioner of alcoholism and substance abuse services.
Title
Safeguards cash accounts for people with developmental disabilities in a facility under the control of the commissioner of mental health, the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities and the commissioner of alcoholism and substance abuse services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.970 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1273A |
2022-01-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO DISABILITIES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2021-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.195 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00834 (Same As) 2022-02-15 - reported referred to ways and means