NY S01276 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permits physicians who are licensed in another state or territory to provide medical services to athletes and team personnel at team sporting events in New York, provided such services are provided only to those athletes and team personnel at the team sporting event.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits physicians who are licensed in another state or territory to provide medical services to athletes and team personnel at team sporting events in New York, provided such services are provided only to those athletes and team personnel at the team sporting event.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-29AssemblySIGNED CHAP.199
2019-08-23SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-03-11Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-03-11Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-11Assemblyordered to third reading cal.106
2019-03-11Assemblysubstituted for a2634
2019-01-15Assemblyreferred to higher education
2019-01-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.19
2019-01-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A02634 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - substituted by s1276

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback