NY S01277 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a certified psychologist or a certified nurse practitioner, in addition to other authorized individuals, to make a recommendation of the type of residence in which a patient is to live upon release into the community.
Title
Authorizes a certified psychologist or a certified nurse practitioner, in addition to other authorized individuals, to make a recommendation of the type of residence in which a patient is to live upon release into the community.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-06-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1139 |
2012-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1277A |
2012-05-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2011-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A01481 (Same As) 2012-06-12 - held for consideration in mental health