NY S01283 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a public service commission nominating board to make recommendations of persons qualified for appointment as commissioners of the public service commission.
Title
Establishes a public service commission nominating board to make recommendations of persons qualified for appointment as commissioners of the public service commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.436 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03819 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions