NY S01298 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that no bill which increases, extends, imposes or revives any tax, fee, assessment, surcharge or any other such levy or collection, be passed or become a law, except by the assent of two-thirds of the members elected to each branch of the legislature voting separately; makes an exception for any bill which results from the passage of a home rule message.
Title
Provides that no bill which increases, extends, imposes or revives any tax, fee, assessment, surcharge or any other such levy or collection, be passed or become a law, except by the assent of two-thirds of the members elected to each branch of the legislature voting separately; makes an exception for any bill which results from the passage of a home rule message.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Serino [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-27 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-07 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |