NY S01306 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - SIGNED CHAP.67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - SIGNED CHAP.67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Adirondack road salt reduction task force and pilot program.
Title
Establishes the Adirondack road salt reduction task force and pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.67 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.84 |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | substituted for a990 |
2021-02-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-02-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.77 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00990 (Same As) 2021-02-10 - substituted by s1306