NY S01318 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - SIGNED CHAP.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - SIGNED CHAP.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the profession of massage therapy and the authority of massage therapists licensed in other jurisdictions to conduct teaching demonstrations for continuing education programs.
Title
Relates to the profession of massage therapy and the authority of massage therapists licensed in other jurisdictions to conduct teaching demonstrations for continuing education programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.10 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.60 |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | substituted for a871 |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-02-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-02-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-01-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.15 |
2015-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00871 (Same As) 2015-03-09 - substituted by s1318