NY S01318 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowances for the costs, up to eighty dollars, of diapers for an eligible child, two years of age or younger.
Title
Relates to allowances for the costs, up to eighty dollars, of diapers for an eligible child, two years of age or younger.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-03-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A05973 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means