NY S01318 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1324A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1324A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides total disability benefits for volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance workers for injuries sustained on or after July 1, 2021.
Title
Provides total disability benefits for volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance workers for injuries sustained on or after July 1, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1324A |
2021-05-19 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1318A |
2021-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.898 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01324 (Same As) 2021-10-29 - signed chap.523