NY S01343 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-17 - PRINT NUMBER 1343C
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-17 - PRINT NUMBER 1343C
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies the standard of evidence and certain other procedures when determining whether to revoke the community supervision of a person.
Title
Modifies the standard of evidence and certain other procedures when determining whether to revoke the community supervision of a person.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1343C |
2020-04-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-04-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1343B |
2019-04-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-02-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1343A |
2019-02-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A05493 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - print number 5493b