NY S01347 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring the state to fund certain programs mandated for municipal corporations and school districts.
Title
Relates to requiring the state to fund certain programs mandated for municipal corporations and school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.263 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1347A |
2018-01-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-03-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.122 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05059 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - print number 5059a