NY S01353 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.77
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.77
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing an obligation to affirmatively further fair housing by state departments, agencies or offices administering housing laws or housing programs and by any localities receiving state funds to administer programs and activities related to housing.
Title
Relates to establishing an obligation to affirmatively further fair housing by state departments, agencies or offices administering housing laws or housing programs and by any localities receiving state funds to administer programs and activities related to housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.77 |
2021-12-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.690 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.324 |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a5428a |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1353A |
2021-05-24 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2021-02-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.112 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05428 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - substituted by s1353a