NY S01356 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that an energy services supplier which is not an electric or natural gas utility corporation or a municipality shall provide certain informational notices on utility bills annually.
Title
Requires that an energy services supplier which is not an electric or natural gas utility corporation or a municipality shall provide certain informational notices on utility bills annually.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.168 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |