NY S01366 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the department of transportation to issue seasonal agricultural permits for oversize vehicles.
Title
Allows the department of transportation to issue seasonal agricultural permits for oversize vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.233 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03700 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation