NY S01378 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities to offer a real property tax exemption for property owned by certain persons performing active duty in a combat zone in an amount to the extent of fifteen percent of the assessed value of the real property, but shall not exceed twelve thousand dollars.
Title
Authorizes municipalities to offer a real property tax exemption for property owned by certain persons performing active duty in a combat zone in an amount to the extent of fifteen percent of the assessed value of the real property, but shall not exceed twelve thousand dollars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2022-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.803 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2021-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1378A |
2021-02-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-01-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.153 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |