NY S01379 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to significant programmatic accomplishment for limited credit time allowances for certain inmates; now includes completion of an associate's, bachelor's or master's degree.
Title
Relates to significant programmatic accomplishment for limited credit time allowances for certain inmates; now includes completion of an associate's, bachelor's or master's degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.70 |
2019-12-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.723 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.321 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | substituted for a882 |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.23 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00882 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.70